Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021