Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB477 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 477
1+87R16173 BEF-F
2+ By: Nelson S.B. No. 477
3+ (Meyer)
4+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 477: No.
25
36
7+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
48 AN ACT
59 relating to the administration and collection of sales and use
610 taxes and certain fees applicable to sales involving marketplace
711 providers.
812 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
913 SECTION 1. Effective July 1, 2022, Section 361.138(a),
1014 Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (2-a) to
1115 read as follows:
1216 (2-a) "Marketplace provider" has the meaning assigned
1317 by Section 151.0242(a), Tax Code.
1418 SECTION 2. Effective July 1, 2022, Sections 361.138(b),
1519 (c), and (i), Health and Safety Code, are amended to read as
1620 follows:
1721 (b) A wholesale or retail battery dealer who sells or offers
1822 to sell, or a marketplace provider who processes sales of or
1923 payments for, lead-acid batteries not for resale shall collect at
2024 the time and place of sale a fee for each nonexempt lead-acid
2125 battery sold, according to the following schedule:
2226 (1) for a lead-acid battery with a capacity of less
2327 than 12 volts, a fee of $2;
2428 (2) for a lead-acid battery with a capacity of 12 or
2529 more volts, a fee of $3.
2630 (c) A dealer or marketplace provider required to collect a
2731 fee under this section:
2832 (1) shall list as a separate item on an invoice a fee
2933 due under this section; and
3034 (2) except as provided by Subsection (d), on or before
3135 the 20th day of the month following the end of each calendar month
3236 and on a form and in the manner prescribed by the comptroller, shall
3337 file a report with and shall remit to the comptroller the amount of
3438 fees collected during the preceding calendar month.
3539 (i) A dealer or marketplace provider required to collect a
3640 fee under this section may retain 2-1/2 cents from each fee the
3741 person [dealer] collects. A dealer or marketplace provider shall
3842 account for amounts retained under this subsection in the manner
3943 prescribed by the comptroller.
4044 SECTION 3. Effective July 1, 2022, Section 771.0712, Health
4145 and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as
4246 follows:
4347 (e) A marketplace provider, as defined by Section
4448 151.0242(a), Tax Code, shall:
4549 (1) collect on behalf of the seller the fee imposed by
4650 this section on a sale made through the marketplace; and
4751 (2) after making the deduction authorized to be made
4852 by a seller under Subsection (a), remit the fee to the comptroller
4953 in the same manner a seller remits collected fees under this
5054 section.
5155 SECTION 4. Section 151.0242, Tax Code, is amended by adding
5256 Subsection (l) to read as follows:
5357 (l) A marketplace seller who places a ticket or other
5458 admission document for sale through a marketplace must certify to
5559 the marketplace provider that the taxes imposed by this chapter on
5660 the original purchase of the ticket or admission document were
5761 paid. A marketplace provider who in good faith accepts a
5862 marketplace seller's certification under this subsection may take
5963 the deduction provided by Section 151.432 on behalf of the
6064 marketplace seller.
6165 SECTION 5. Section 151.304, Tax Code, is amended by adding
6266 Subsection (h) to read as follows:
6367 (h) This section does not apply to the sale of a taxable item
6468 made by a marketplace seller through a marketplace, as those terms
6569 are defined by Section 151.0242(a).
6670 SECTION 6. Section 321.203(e-1), Tax Code, is amended to
6771 read as follows:
6872 (e-1) Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (f), (g),
6973 (g-1), (g-2), (g-3), (h), (i), (j), (k), (m), or (n)
7074 [Notwithstanding any other provision of this section], a sale of a
7175 taxable item made by a marketplace seller through a marketplace as
7276 provided by Section 151.0242 is consummated at the location in this
7377 state to which the item is shipped or delivered or at which
7478 possession is taken by the purchaser.
7579 SECTION 7. Section 323.203(e-1), Tax Code, is amended to
7680 read as follows:
7781 (e-1) Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (f), (g),
7882 (g-1), (g-2), (g-3), (h), (i), (j), (k), or (m) [Notwithstanding
7983 any other provision of this section], a sale of a taxable item made
8084 by a marketplace seller through a marketplace as provided by
8185 Section 151.0242 is consummated at the location in this state to
8286 which the item is shipped or delivered or at which possession is
8387 taken by the purchaser.
8488 SECTION 8. A change in law made by this Act does not affect
8589 tax liability accruing before the effective date of the change in
8690 law. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
8791 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
8892 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
8993 the liability for those taxes.
9094 SECTION 9. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
9195 Act takes effect October 1, 2021.
92- ______________________________ ______________________________
93- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
94- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 477 passed the Senate on
95- April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
96- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
97- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
98- ______________________________
99- Secretary of the Senate
100- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 477 passed the House, with
101- amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 130,
102- Nays 15, two present not voting.
103- ______________________________
104- Chief Clerk of the House
105- Approved:
106- ______________________________
107- Date
108- ______________________________
109- Governor