Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021