Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021