Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB538 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2021

                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 538
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 8, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 15,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information technology purchased through the
 Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2157.068(a) and (e-3), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "commodity items" means commercial
 software, hardware, or technology services, other than
 telecommunications services, that are generally available to
 businesses or the public and for which the department determines
 that a reasonable demand exists from [in] two or more customers,
 including state agencies and political subdivisions of this state,
 entities described by Subsection (j), and governmental entities of
 another state, that purchase the items through the department. The
 term includes seat management, through which a customer [state
 agency] transfers its personal computer equipment and service
 responsibilities to a private vendor to manage the personal
 computing needs for each desktop of the customer [in the state
 agency], including all necessary hardware, software, and support
 services.
 (e-3)  The procedural requirements of Subsection (e-1) and
 the limitation prescribed by Subsection (e-2) do not apply to a
 state agency's purchase of commodity items under a department
 contract for the bulk purchase of commodity items intended for use
 by more than one customer [state agency].
 SECTION 2.  Section 2157.182, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2157.182.  VALIDITY OF PREAPPROVED TERMS AND
 CONDITIONS; RENEGOTIATION. (a) Preapproved terms and conditions
 to which a vendor, the comptroller, and the department agree are
 valid for the duration of the initial contract [two years after the
 date of the agreement] and must include a provision authorizing the
 department to renegotiate [provide that] the terms and conditions
 at any time before the contract expires [are to be renegotiated
 before the end of the two years].
 (b)  The comptroller and the department jointly shall
 establish procedures to ensure that terms and conditions may be
 [are] renegotiated before they expire in a contract between the
 vendor and a state agency.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2157.182, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a contract executed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  A contract executed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before that date, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *