Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021