Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB538 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/11/2021

                    S.B. No. 538


 AN ACT
 relating to information technology purchased through the
 Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2157.068(a) and (e-3), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "commodity items" means commercial
 software, hardware, or technology services, other than
 telecommunications services, that are generally available to
 businesses or the public and for which the department determines
 that a reasonable demand exists from [in] two or more customers,
 including state agencies and political subdivisions of this state,
 entities described by Subsection (j), and governmental entities of
 another state, that purchase the items through the department. The
 term includes seat management, through which a customer [state
 agency] transfers its personal computer equipment and service
 responsibilities to a private vendor to manage the personal
 computing needs for each desktop of the customer [in the state
 agency], including all necessary hardware, software, and support
 services.
 (e-3)  The procedural requirements of Subsection (e-1) and
 the limitation prescribed by Subsection (e-2) do not apply to a
 state agency's purchase of commodity items under a department
 contract for the bulk purchase of commodity items intended for use
 by more than one customer [state agency].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 538 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 538 passed the House, with
 amendment, on April 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor