Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021