2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read |
---|
3 | | - | first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; |
---|
4 | | - | May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, |
---|
6 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 54 By: West |
---|
9 | 3 | | |
---|
10 | 4 | | |
---|
11 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 7 | | relating to a study and report by the Texas Higher Education |
---|
14 | 8 | | Coordinating Board regarding best practices for assisting students |
---|
15 | 9 | | with autism spectrum disorder. |
---|
16 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
17 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
18 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 61.06694 to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 13 | | Sec. 61.06694. STUDY AND REPORT ON ASSISTING STUDENTS WITH |
---|
20 | 14 | | AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDER. (a) The board shall conduct a study to |
---|
21 | 15 | | determine best practices for assisting students with autism |
---|
22 | 16 | | spectrum disorder who are enrolled at institutions of higher |
---|
23 | 17 | | education. |
---|
24 | 18 | | (b) The study must: |
---|
25 | 19 | | (1) identify and track: |
---|
26 | 20 | | (A) the number of students with autism spectrum |
---|
27 | 21 | | disorder who graduate from secondary schools in this state; |
---|
28 | 22 | | (B) the number of students with autism spectrum |
---|
29 | 23 | | disorder who are enrolled at institutions of higher education; |
---|
30 | 24 | | (C) the student financial assistance available |
---|
31 | 25 | | to students with autism spectrum disorder who enroll at |
---|
32 | 26 | | institutions of higher education; and |
---|
33 | 27 | | (D) the graduation rates of students with autism |
---|
34 | 28 | | spectrum disorder who enroll at institutions of higher education; |
---|
35 | 29 | | and |
---|
36 | 30 | | (2) identify and examine best practices and program |
---|
37 | 31 | | modules from public and private institutions of higher education |
---|
38 | 32 | | outside this state that have achieved successful results in working |
---|
39 | 33 | | with students with autism spectrum disorder. |
---|
40 | | - | (c) In conducting the study, the board: |
---|
41 | | - | (1) shall collaborate with the Texas Education Agency |
---|
42 | | - | regarding specialized programs offered by elementary or secondary |
---|
43 | | - | schools for students with autism spectrum disorder to determine how |
---|
44 | | - | those programs could be replicated at or extended to postsecondary |
---|
45 | | - | institutions; and |
---|
46 | | - | (2) may not request, require, or use personally |
---|
47 | | - | identifiable student information. |
---|
| 34 | + | (c) In conducting the study, the board shall collaborate |
---|
| 35 | + | with school districts that offer specialized programs for students |
---|
| 36 | + | with autism spectrum disorder to determine how those programs could |
---|
| 37 | + | be replicated at or extended to postsecondary institutions. |
---|
48 | 38 | | (d) Not later than December 1, 2023, the board shall submit |
---|
49 | 39 | | to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house |
---|
50 | 40 | | of representatives, and the commissioner of education a written |
---|
51 | 41 | | report that includes the study's findings and any recommendations |
---|
52 | 42 | | for legislative or other action. |
---|
53 | 43 | | (e) This section expires January 1, 2024. |
---|
54 | 44 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
55 | 45 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
56 | 46 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
57 | 47 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
58 | 48 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|