House
|
05/24/2021
|
Postponed 5/18/22 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 10(b)
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|