Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note May 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021