House
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|