Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021