Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021