Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021