Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB611 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 611


 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence
 homestead of the surviving spouse of a member of the armed services
 of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of
 duty and to late applications for exemptions from such taxation for
 disabled members.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 11.133, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.133.  RESIDENCE HOMESTEAD OF SURVIVING SPOUSE OF
 MEMBER OF ARMED SERVICES KILLED IN LINE OF DUTY [ACTION].
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.133(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  The surviving spouse of a member of the armed services
 of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of
 duty [in action] is entitled to an exemption from taxation of the
 total appraised value of the surviving spouse's residence homestead
 if the surviving spouse has not remarried since the death of the
 member of the armed services.
 SECTION 3.  Section 11.431(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 11.439, the [The] chief
 appraiser shall accept and approve or deny an application for a
 residence homestead exemption[, including an exemption under
 Section 11.131 or 11.132 for the residence homestead of a disabled
 veteran or the surviving spouse of a disabled veteran, an exemption
 under Section 11.133 for the residence homestead of the surviving
 spouse of a member of the armed services of the United States who is
 killed in action, or an exemption under Section 11.134 for the
 residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a first responder
 who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty,] after the
 deadline for filing it has passed if it is filed not later than two
 years after the delinquency date for the taxes on the homestead.
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Section 11.439, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.439.  LATE APPLICATIONS [APPLICATION] FOR DISABLED
 VETERANS EXEMPTIONS [EXEMPTION].
 SECTION 5.  Section 11.439(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  The chief appraiser shall accept and approve or deny an
 application for an exemption under Section 11.131 or 11.132 for the
 residence homestead of a disabled veteran but not the surviving
 spouse of the disabled veteran or Section 11.22 after the filing
 deadline provided by Section 11.43 if the application is filed not
 later than five years after the delinquency date for the taxes on
 the property.
 SECTION 6.  Section 11.133, Tax Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies only to a tax year beginning on or after January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 7.  Sections 11.431 and 11.439, Tax Code, as amended
 by this Act, apply only to an application for an exemption filed for
 a tax year that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 (b)  Section 11.133, Tax Code, as amended by this Act, takes
 effect January 1, 2022, but only if the constitutional amendment
 proposed by the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021,
 authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad
 valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence
 homestead of the surviving spouse of a member of the armed services
 of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of
 duty is approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved
 by the voters, Section 11.133, Tax Code, as amended by this Act, has
 no effect.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 611 passed the Senate on
 April 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 611 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor