Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB64 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 18, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021