4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to a peer support network for certain law enforcement |
---|
6 | 8 | | personnel. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 11 | | adding Subchapter M-1 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 12 | | SUBCHAPTER M-1. PEER SUPPORT NETWORK FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS |
---|
11 | 13 | | Sec. 1701.621. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
12 | 14 | | (1) "Law enforcement officer" means a person |
---|
13 | 15 | | identified as a peace officer under Article 2.12(1), (2), (3), or |
---|
14 | 16 | | (4), Code of Criminal Procedure. |
---|
15 | 17 | | (2) "Peer" means a person who is a law enforcement |
---|
16 | 18 | | officer or retired law enforcement officer. |
---|
17 | 19 | | Sec. 1701.622. GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) The |
---|
18 | 20 | | commission shall develop a peer support network for law enforcement |
---|
19 | 21 | | officers. The network must include: |
---|
20 | 22 | | (1) peer-to-peer support; |
---|
21 | 23 | | (2) training for peer service coordinators and peers |
---|
22 | 24 | | that includes suicide prevention training; |
---|
23 | 25 | | (3) technical assistance for program development, |
---|
24 | 26 | | peer service coordinators, licensed mental health professionals, |
---|
25 | 27 | | and peers; and |
---|
26 | 28 | | (4) identification, retention, and screening of |
---|
27 | 29 | | licensed mental health professionals. |
---|
28 | 30 | | (b) As part of the peer support network for law enforcement |
---|
29 | 31 | | officers, the commission shall ensure law enforcement officers have |
---|
30 | 32 | | support in both urban and rural jurisdictions. |
---|
31 | 33 | | (c) The commission shall solicit and ensure that |
---|
32 | 34 | | specialized training is provided to persons who are peers and who |
---|
33 | 35 | | want to provide peer-to-peer support and other peer-to-peer |
---|
34 | 36 | | services under the network. |
---|
35 | 37 | | (d) The commission may adopt rules necessary to implement |
---|
36 | 38 | | this subchapter. |
---|
37 | 39 | | Sec. 1701.623. CONTRACT WITH INSTITUTION OF HIGHER |
---|
38 | 40 | | EDUCATION. The commission may contract with an institution of |
---|
39 | 41 | | higher education that has appropriate expertise in mental health or |
---|
40 | 42 | | law enforcement to develop the peer support network under this |
---|
41 | 43 | | subchapter. |
---|
42 | 44 | | Sec. 1701.624. CONFIDENTIALITY OF PARTICIPANT INFORMATION. |
---|
43 | 45 | | Information relating to a law enforcement officer's participation |
---|
44 | 46 | | in peer-to-peer support and other peer-to-peer services under the |
---|
45 | 47 | | network is confidential and may not be disclosed under Chapter 552, |
---|
46 | 48 | | Government Code, by: |
---|
47 | 49 | | (1) the commission; |
---|
48 | 50 | | (2) a law enforcement agency that employs a law |
---|
49 | 51 | | enforcement officer participant; or |
---|
50 | 52 | | (3) any other state agency or political subdivision in |
---|
51 | 53 | | this state that employs a law enforcement officer participant. |
---|
52 | 54 | | Sec. 1701.625. PROTECTIONS RELATED TO LICENSURE. A law |
---|
53 | 55 | | enforcement officer's participation in peer-to-peer support and |
---|
54 | 56 | | other peer-to-peer services under the network may not: |
---|
55 | 57 | | (1) serve as the basis for a revocation, suspension, |
---|
56 | 58 | | or denial of a license issued under this chapter; or |
---|
57 | 59 | | (2) be considered in any proceeding related to the |
---|
58 | 60 | | officer's licensure under this chapter. |
---|
59 | 61 | | Sec. 1701.626. ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than December 1 of |
---|
60 | 62 | | each year, the commission shall submit a report to the governor and |
---|
61 | 63 | | the legislature that includes: |
---|
62 | 64 | | (1) the number of law enforcement officers who |
---|
63 | 65 | | received peer support through the peer support network for law |
---|
64 | 66 | | enforcement officers; |
---|
65 | 67 | | (2) the number of peers and peer service coordinators |
---|
66 | 68 | | trained; |
---|
67 | 69 | | (3) an evaluation of the services provided under this |
---|
68 | 70 | | subchapter; and |
---|
69 | 71 | | (4) recommendations for program improvements. |
---|
70 | 72 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas |
---|
71 | 73 | | Commission on Law Enforcement shall develop the peer support |
---|
72 | 74 | | network for law enforcement officers, as required under Subchapter |
---|
73 | 75 | | M-1, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
74 | 76 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
75 | 77 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
76 | 78 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
77 | 79 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
78 | 80 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
79 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
80 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
81 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 64 passed the Senate on |
---|
82 | | - | March 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
83 | | - | May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
84 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House |
---|
85 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
86 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
87 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
88 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
90 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 64 passed the House, with |
---|
91 | | - | amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 140, |
---|
92 | | - | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request |
---|
93 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
94 | | - | May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
95 | | - | following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
96 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
98 | | - | Approved: |
---|
99 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
100 | | - | Date |
---|
101 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
102 | | - | Governor |
---|