Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021