Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB640 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 640
1+By: Menéndez, et al. S.B. No. 640
2+ (Cortez)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to a study on the interoperability needs and technology
68 readiness of behavioral health service providers in this state.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. (a) In this section:
911 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
1012 Commission.
1113 (2) "Executive commissioner" means the executive
1214 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
1315 (b) The commission shall conduct a study to assess the
1416 interoperability needs and technology readiness of behavioral
1517 health service providers in this state, including the needs and
1618 readiness of each:
1719 (1) state hospital, as defined by Section 552.0011,
1820 Health and Safety Code;
1921 (2) local mental health authority, as defined by
2022 Section 531.002, Health and Safety Code;
2123 (3) freestanding psychiatric hospital;
2224 (4) high volume provider group under the STAR+PLUS,
2325 STAR Kids, or STAR Health Medicaid managed care programs;
2426 (5) Medicaid payor;
2527 (6) county jail, municipal jail, and other local law
2628 enforcement entity involved in providing behavioral health
2729 services; and
2830 (7) trauma service area regional advisory council.
2931 (c) In conducting the study under Subsection (b) of this
3032 section, the commission shall determine which of the providers
3133 described by that subsection use an electronic health record
3234 management system and evaluate:
3335 (1) for each of those providers that use an electronic
3436 health record management system:
3537 (A) when the provider implemented the electronic
3638 health record management system;
3739 (B) whether the provider is also connected to a
3840 system outside of the provider's electronic health record
3941 management system and, if the provider is connected to an outside
4042 system:
4143 (i) to what outside system the provider is
4244 connected and how the provider is connected;
4345 (ii) what type of information the provider
4446 shares with the outside system, including information on admissions
4547 or discharges, dispensing of medication, and clinical notes; and
4648 (iii) what type of information the provider
4749 receives from the outside system, including new patient information
4850 and the receipt of real time notifications of patient events; and
4951 (C) what the provider finds valuable about using
5052 an electronic health record management system or being connected to
5153 an outside system, including:
5254 (i) whether the provider uses a
5355 prescription drug monitoring program as part of the electronic
5456 health record management system or the outside system and the
5557 provider's reason for using or not using a prescription drug
5658 monitoring program, as applicable;
5759 (ii) whether, in using the electronic
5860 health record management system or being connected to an outside
5961 system, the provider finds valuable the use of qualitative data for
6062 improving patient care; and
6163 (iii) the provider's opinion on the
6264 efficiency and cost-effectiveness of using an electronic health
6365 record management system or being connected to an outside system;
6466 and
6567 (2) for both the providers who use an electronic
6668 health record management system or an outside system and the
6769 providers who do not use either system, barriers to being connected
6870 or to becoming connected, as applicable, including:
6971 (A) whether they consider any of the following a
7072 barrier:
7173 (i) the cost of using either system;
7274 (ii) security or privacy concerns with
7375 using either system;
7476 (iii) patient consent issues associated
7577 with using either system; or
7678 (iv) legal, regulatory, or licensing
7779 factors associated with using either system; and
7880 (B) for the providers who are not connected to
7981 either system, whether and for what reasons they consider being
8082 connected valuable or useful to treating patients.
8183 (d) In conducting the study under Subsection (b) of this
8284 section, the commission may collaborate with any relevant advisory
8385 committees.
8486 (e) Based on the results of the study conducted under
8587 Subsection (b) of this section and not later than August 31, 2022,
8688 the commission shall prepare and submit to the legislature,
8789 lieutenant governor, and governor a written report that includes:
8890 (1) a state plan, including a proposed timeline, for
8991 aligning the interoperability and technological capabilities in
9092 the provision of behavioral health services with applicable law,
9193 including:
9294 (A) the 21st Century Cures Act (Pub. L.
9395 No. 114-255);
9496 (B) federal or state law on health information
9597 technology; and
9698 (C) the delivery system reform incentive payment
9799 program and uniform hospital rate increase program;
98100 (2) information on gaps in education, and
99101 recommendations for closing those gaps, regarding the appropriate
100102 sharing of behavioral health data, including education on:
101103 (A) the sharing of progress notes versus
102104 psychotherapy notes;
103105 (B) obtaining consent for electronic data
104106 sharing; and
105107 (C) common provider and patient
106108 misunderstandings of applicable law;
107109 (3) an evaluation of the differences and similarities
108110 between federal and state law on the interoperability and
109111 technological requirements in the provision of behavioral health
110112 services; and
111113 (4) recommendations for standardizing the use of
112114 social determinants of health.
113115 (f) To the extent permitted by law and as the executive
114116 commissioner determines appropriate, the commission shall
115117 implement, within the commission's prescribed authority, a
116118 component of the plan or a regulatory recommendation included in
117119 the report required under Subsection (e) of this section.
118120 SECTION 2. This Act expires September 1, 2023.
119121 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 640 passed the Senate on
123- April 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
124- ______________________________
125- Secretary of the Senate
126- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 640 passed the House on
127- May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 99, Nays 48, two
128- present not voting.
129- ______________________________
130- Chief Clerk of the House
131- Approved:
132- ______________________________
133- Date
134- ______________________________
135- Governor