2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2021; March 11, 2021, |
---|
3 | | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & |
---|
4 | | - | Economic Development; April 12, 2021, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | | - | following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 12, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 3 | | |
---|
8 | 4 | | |
---|
9 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 7 | | relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission. |
---|
12 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 12.057(b), Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
14 | 10 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 11 | | (b) Not later than July 30, 2023 [2021], the commission |
---|
16 | 12 | | shall issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor, |
---|
17 | 13 | | speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees |
---|
18 | 14 | | of the legislature. |
---|
19 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Section 12.058, Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
20 | 16 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
21 | 17 | | Sec. 12.058. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
22 | 18 | | expires December 31, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
23 | 19 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
24 | 20 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
25 | 21 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
26 | 22 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
27 | 23 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|