Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB676 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/12/2021

                            By: Springer S.B. No. 676
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 12, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 12, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.057(b), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than July 30, 2023 [2021], the commission
 shall issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor,
 speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees
 of the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.058, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.058.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 expires December 31, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *