Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#1531
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Amended 1-Krause
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2020
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|