Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB68 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021