Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB68 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 68
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 19, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 68 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a duty for peace officers to intervene and make a report
 when a peace officer uses excessive force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.1387 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.1387.  INTERVENTION REQUIRED FOR EXCESSIVE FORCE;
 REPORT REQUIRED. (a) A peace officer has a duty to intervene to
 stop or prevent another peace officer from using force against a
 person suspected of committing an offense if:
 (1)  the amount of force exceeds that which is
 reasonable under the circumstances; and
 (2)  the officer knows or should know that the other
 officer's use of force:
 (A)  violates state or federal law;
 (B)  puts a person at risk of bodily injury, as
 that term is defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, and is not
 immediately necessary to avoid imminent bodily injury to a peace
 officer or other person; and
 (C)  is not required to apprehend the person
 suspected of committing an offense.
 (b)  A peace officer who witnesses the use of excessive force
 by another peace officer shall promptly make a detailed report of
 the incident and deliver the report to the supervisor of the peace
 officer making the report.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *