Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB69 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021