Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB69 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 69


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of force by peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Articles 2.1387 and 2.33 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.1387.  INTERVENTION REQUIRED FOR EXCESSIVE FORCE;
 REPORT REQUIRED. (a) A peace officer has a duty to intervene to
 stop or prevent another peace officer from using force against a
 person suspected of committing an offense if:
 (1)  the amount of force exceeds that which is
 reasonable under the circumstances; and
 (2)  the officer knows or should know that the other
 officer's use of force:
 (A)  violates state or federal law;
 (B)  puts a person at risk of bodily injury, as
 that term is defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, and is not
 immediately necessary to avoid imminent bodily injury to a peace
 officer or other person; and
 (C)  is not required to apprehend the person
 suspected of committing an offense.
 (b)  A peace officer who witnesses the use of excessive force
 by another peace officer shall promptly make a detailed report of
 the incident and deliver the report to the supervisor of the peace
 officer making the report.
 Art. 2.33.  USE OF NECK RESTRAINTS DURING SEARCH OR ARREST
 PROHIBITED. A peace officer may not intentionally use a choke hold,
 carotid artery hold, or similar neck restraint in searching or
 arresting a person unless the restraint is necessary to prevent
 serious bodily injury to or the death of the officer or another
 person.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 69 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 69 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 5, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor