Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB695 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 695
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:   Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 695 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the service of a notice of assessment by the Texas
 Workforce Commission under the Texas Unemployment Compensation
 Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 213.032(a), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A notice of assessment shall be served on a defaulting
 employer:
 (1)  by personal delivery;
 (2)  by registered or certified mail, return receipt
 requested, or similar common carrier method to the employer's
 address as shown by commission records; or
 (3)  if an attempt to serve a notice of the assessment
 in a manner described by Subdivision (1) or (2) has been
 unsuccessful, in another manner that is reasonably calculated to
 give the employer notice of the assessment [in the manner provided
 by law for service of process on a defendant in a civil action in
 district court].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *