Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021