Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021