Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB699 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hughes S.B. No. 699
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2021; March 11, 2021,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture &
4+ Rural Affairs; April 26, 2021, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 26, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to a study of the conversion of surface mine pits and
712 quarries to water storage reservoirs in order to enhance this
813 state's available water supply.
914 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1015 SECTION 1. (a) The legislature shall establish a joint
1116 interim committee to study the conversion of surface mine pits and
1217 quarries to water storage reservoirs in order to enhance this
1318 state's available water supply.
1419 (b) The joint interim committee is composed of:
1520 (1) members of the Senate Natural Resources and
1621 Economic Development Committee appointed by the lieutenant
1722 governor;
1823 (2) members of the Senate Water, Agriculture and Rural
1924 Affairs Committee appointed by the lieutenant governor;
2025 (3) members of the House Natural Resources Committee
2126 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
2227 (4) members of the House Energy Resources Committee
2328 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
2429 (c) The lieutenant governor or the speaker of the house of
2530 representatives, as applicable, may not appoint more than three
2631 members from a committee described by Subsection (b) of this
2732 section to the joint interim committee.
2833 (d) The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
2934 representatives shall jointly designate a chair or, alternatively,
3035 designate two co-chairs from among the committee membership.
3136 (e) The committee may adopt rules as necessary to carry out
3237 the committee's duties under this Act.
3338 (f) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, the
3439 Railroad Commission of Texas, and the Texas Water Development Board
3540 shall provide administrative support and resources to the
3641 committee.
3742 (g) Not later than December 1, 2022, the committee shall
3843 prepare and deliver a report to the governor and the legislature
3944 that:
4045 (1) provides an overview of:
4146 (A) the lignite industry in this state and final
4247 reclamation practices of that industry; and
4348 (B) large sand and gravel producers in this
4449 state;
4550 (2) identifies surface mine pits and quarries that
4651 could potentially be used as water storage reservoirs and provides
4752 the following information for each location:
4853 (A) the volume of water that could be stored at
4954 the location;
5055 (B) the predicted water quality of a reservoir
5156 created at the location;
5257 (C) the predicted effect on watersheds
5358 surrounding a reservoir created at the location;
5459 (D) the sustainability of a reservoir created at
5560 the location;
5661 (E) the reclamation status of the location;
5762 (F) information needed to assess ownership
5863 issues at the location, including any constraint that the ownership
5964 of the property may impose on the use of the property as a
6065 reservoir; and
6166 (G) a comparison of the estimated cost of
6267 converting the location into a reservoir and the estimated cost of
6368 filling in and regrading the location to the approximate original
6469 contour;
6570 (3) contains a map of the locations identified under
6671 Subdivision (2) of this subsection;
6772 (4) provides a review of the regulatory issues and
6873 constraints associated with converting surface mine pits and
6974 quarries into reservoirs; and
7075 (5) summarizes the effect that a statewide initiative
7176 to convert surface mine pits and quarries into reservoirs would
7277 have on state water resources.
7378 (h) The committee is abolished and this Act expires January
7479 10, 2023.
7580 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
81+ * * * * *