Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021