Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB702 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 702
1+By: Paxton, et al. S.B. No. 702
2+ (Paddie)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the continuation and functions of the Prepaid Higher
68 Education Tuition Board.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Section 54.603, Education Code, is amended to
911 read as follows:
1012 Sec. 54.603. SUNSET PROVISION. The Prepaid Higher
1113 Education Tuition Board is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code
1214 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by
1315 that chapter, the board is abolished [and the programs established
1416 under this subchapter and under Subchapters G and H terminate]
1517 September 1, 2033 [2021].
1618 SECTION 2. Section 54.610, Education Code, is amended by
1719 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
1820 follows:
1921 (b) The [A] training program must [established under this
2022 section shall] provide the person with information [to the member]
2123 regarding:
2224 (1) the law governing [enabling legislation that
2325 created the] board operations;
2426 (2) the programs, functions, rules, and budget of
2527 [operated by] the board;
2628 (3) the scope of and limitations on the rulemaking
2729 authority [role and functions] of the board;
2830 (4) [the rules of the board, with an emphasis on the
2931 rules that relate to disciplinary and investigatory authority;
3032 [(5) the current budget for the board;
3133 [(6)] the results of the most recent formal audit of
3234 the board;
3335 (5) [(7)] the requirements of [the]:
3436 (A) laws relating to open meetings, public
3537 information, [law, Chapter 551, Government Code;
3638 [(B) open records law, Chapter 552, Government
3739 Code; and
3840 [(C)] administrative procedure, and disclosing
3941 conflicts [law, Chapter 2001, Government Code;
4042 [(8) the requirements of the conflict] of interest;
4143 [laws] and
4244 (B) other laws applicable to members of a state
4345 policy-making body in performing their duties [relating to public
4446 officials]; and
4547 (6) [(9)] any applicable ethics policies adopted by
4648 the board or the Texas Ethics Commission.
4749 (d) The executive director of the board shall create a
4850 training manual that includes the information required by
4951 Subsection (b). The executive director shall distribute a copy of
5052 the training manual annually to each board member. Each board
5153 member shall sign and submit to the executive director a statement
5254 acknowledging that the member received and has reviewed the
5355 training manual.
5456 SECTION 3. Section 54.617(e), Education Code, is amended to
5557 read as follows:
5658 (e) The board shall periodically notify the complaint
5759 parties of the status of the complaint until final disposition
5860 unless the notice would jeopardize an investigation.
5961 SECTION 4. Subchapter F, Chapter 54, Education Code, is
6062 amended by adding Section 54.6181 to read as follows:
6163 Sec. 54.6181. ADVISORY COMMITTEES. (a) The board by rule
6264 may establish advisory committees to make recommendations to the
6365 board on programs, rules, and policies administered by the board.
6466 (b) In establishing an advisory committee under this
6567 section, the board shall adopt rules, including rules regarding:
6668 (1) the purpose, role, responsibility, goals, and
6769 duration of the committee;
6870 (2) the size of and quorum requirement for the
6971 committee;
7072 (3) qualifications for committee membership;
7173 (4) appointment procedures for members;
7274 (5) terms of service for members;
7375 (6) training requirements for members;
7476 (7) policies to avoid conflicts of interest by
7577 members;
7678 (8) a periodic review process to evaluate the
7779 continuing need for the committee; and
7880 (9) policies to ensure the committee does not violate
7981 any provision of Chapter 551, Government Code, applicable to the
8082 board or the committee.
8183 (c) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to an
8284 advisory committee created by the board.
8385 SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
8486 this section, Section 54.610, Education Code, as amended by this
8587 Act, applies to a member of the Prepaid Higher Education Tuition
8688 Board appointed before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
8789 (b) A member of the Prepaid Higher Education Tuition Board
8890 who, before the effective date of this Act, completed the training
8991 program required by Section 54.610, Education Code, as that law
9092 existed before the effective date of this Act, is only required to
9193 complete additional training on the subjects added by this Act to
9294 the training program required by Section 54.610, Education Code. A
9395 board member described by this subsection may not vote, deliberate,
9496 or be counted as a member in attendance at a meeting of the board
9597 held on or after December 1, 2021, until the member completes the
9698 additional training.
9799 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
98- ______________________________ ______________________________
99- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
100- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 702 passed the Senate on
101- April 6, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
102- ______________________________
103- Secretary of the Senate
104- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 702 passed the House on
105- May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 13, one
106- present not voting.
107- ______________________________
108- Chief Clerk of the House
109- Approved:
110- ______________________________
111- Date
112- ______________________________
113- Governor