Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021