Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB746 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2021