Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB791 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 791
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 1, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to United
 States Navy submariners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.327 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.327.  UNITED STATES NAVY SUBMARINE SERVICE. The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for persons who
 served on a submarine while in the United States Navy. The license
 plates must include:
 (1)  the words "U.S. Navy Submarine Service" in red
 letters at the bottom of each plate; and
 (2)  a depiction of the Submarine Warfare insignia on
 the left side of the plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *