Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB791 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021