Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB793 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis March 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 28, 2021