Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB793 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 793
1+By: Campbell S.B. No. 793
2+ (King of Parker)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to a ribbon for certain service members of the military who
68 served in support of operations to secure this state's
79 international border.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, is amended
1012 to read as follows:
1113 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
1214 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
1315 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
1416 awarded to a service member who:
1517 (A) after September 11, 2001:
1618 (i) was inducted into federal service from
1719 the Texas National Guard; and
1820 (ii) meets the criteria for an award of the
1921 federal Purple Heart Medal; or
2022 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
2123 November 5, 2009;
2224 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2325 awarded to:
2426 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
2527 who has:
2628 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
2729 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
2830 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
2931 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3032 demanding responsibility; or
3133 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3234 service to the Texas military forces;
3335 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
3436 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
3537 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
3638 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
3739 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
3840 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
3941 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4042 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4143 achievement or service; and
4244 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4345 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
4446 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
4547 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
4648 another state, or the United States who has performed service,
4749 either individually or as a member of a crew, in a superior and
4850 clearly outstanding manner;
4951 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5052 be awarded to a service member who:
5153 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5254 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5355 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5456 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5557 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
5658 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5759 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
5860 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
5961 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6062 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6163 who served:
6264 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6365 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6466 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
6567 and
6668 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
6769 mission in the state under civilian authority;
6870 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
6971 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7072 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7173 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7274 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7375 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7476 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
7577 the United States secretary of defense;
7678 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
7779 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
7880 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
7981 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8082 this state;
8183 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8284 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8385 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8486 extraordinary achievement, either individually or as a member of a
8587 crew, in behalf of the state or United States;
8688 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
8789 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
8890 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
8991 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
9092 great loyalty to this state;
9193 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9294 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9395 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9496 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9597 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
9698 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
9799 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
98100 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
99101 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
100102 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
101103 military duty, after:
102104 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
103105 Freedom; or
104106 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
105107 Dawn;
106108 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
107109 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
108110 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
109111 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
110112 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
111113 military duty; [and]
112114 (15) the Cold War Medal, which, subject to Subsection
113115 (c), shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this
114116 state or the United States who:
115117 (A) served between September 2, 1945, and
116118 December 26, 1991; and
117119 (B) was a resident of this state at the time the
118120 service member entered military service; and
119121 (16) the Texas Border Security and Support Service
120122 Ribbon, which shall be awarded to a service member of the military
121123 forces of this state, another state, or the United States who
122124 served:
123125 (A) on or after July 28, 2014;
124126 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
125127 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code,
126128 for at least 90 consecutive days, or in response to an emergency
127129 activation; and
128130 (C) honorably in support of operations under
129131 civilian authority to secure this state's international border.
130132 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
131- ______________________________ ______________________________
132- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
133- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 793 passed the Senate on
134- April 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
135- ______________________________
136- Secretary of the Senate
137- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 793 passed the House on
138- May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one
139- present not voting.
140- ______________________________
141- Chief Clerk of the House
142- Approved:
143- ______________________________
144- Date
145- ______________________________
146- Governor