Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021