Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB796 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021