Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB804 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2021

                    S.B. No. 804


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a municipality to add property to a
 common characteristic public improvement district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 372.0121, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.0121.  INCLUSION OF PROPERTY [AREA] IN COMMON
 CHARACTERISTIC PUBLIC IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT.  (a) Notwithstanding
 Section 372.012 or any other requirement in this chapter, the
 governing body of a municipality may include property in a public
 improvement district described by Section 372.0035 after the
 establishment of the district if:
 (1)  the property is a hotel; and
 (2)  a sufficient number of the record owners of the
 real property currently included and proposed to be included in the
 district have consented to be included in the district by signing
 the original petition to establish the district or by signing a
 petition or written consent to include property in the district
 [the property could have been included in the district without
 violating Section 372.005(b-1) when the district was created
 regardless of whether the record owners of the property signed the
 original petition].
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), no newly constructed
 hotel property may be added to the district unless the record owner
 of the property consents to its inclusion.
 (c)  For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), the number of
 consenting record owners is sufficient if the record owners own
 more than 60 percent of appraised value of taxable real property
 liable for assessment in the district, as determined by the current
 appraisal roll of the appraisal district in which the property is
 located, and:
 (1)  constitute more than 60 percent of all record
 owners of taxable real property liable for assessment in the
 district; or
 (2)  own, in aggregate, more than 60 percent of the area
 of all taxable real property liable for assessment in the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 804 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 804 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117,
 Nays 28, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor