Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB804 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021