Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB808 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill March 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 23, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021