Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB827 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis March 18, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021