Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB827 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 827
1+87R21898 SMT-F
2+ By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 827
3+ (Lucio III, et al.)
4+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 827: No.
25
36
7+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
48 AN ACT
59 relating to health benefit plan cost-sharing requirements for
610 prescription insulin.
711 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
812 SECTION 1. Chapter 1358, Insurance Code, is amended by
913 adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
1014 SUBCHAPTER C. COST-SHARING LIMIT
1115 Sec. 1358.101. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
1216 subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan that provides
1317 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
1418 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
1519 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
1620 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or a small or large
1721 employer group contract or similar coverage document that is
1822 offered by:
1923 (1) an insurance company;
2024 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
2125 under Chapter 842;
2226 (3) a fraternal benefit society operating under
2327 Chapter 885;
2428 (4) a stipulated premium company operating under
2529 Chapter 884;
2630 (5) a reciprocal exchange operating under Chapter 942;
2731 (6) a health maintenance organization operating under
2832 Chapter 843;
2933 (7) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
3034 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
3135 (8) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
3236 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
3337 (b) This subchapter applies to group health coverage made
3438 available by a school district in accordance with Section 22.004,
3539 Education Code.
3640 (c) Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1551, 1575,
3741 1579, or 1601 or any other law, this subchapter applies to:
3842 (1) a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
3943 (2) a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
4044 (3) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
4145 and
4246 (4) basic coverage under Chapter 1601.
4347 (d) Notwithstanding any other law, this subchapter applies
4448 to coverage under:
4549 (1) the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
4650 Health and Safety Code, or the health benefits plan for children
4751 under Chapter 63, Health and Safety Code; and
4852 (2) the medical assistance program under Chapter 32,
4953 Human Resources Code.
5054 Sec. 1358.102. EXCEPTION. This subchapter does not apply
5155 to:
5256 (1) a health benefit plan that provides coverage:
5357 (A) only for a specified disease or for another
5458 single benefit;
5559 (B) only for accidental death or dismemberment;
5660 (C) for wages or payments in lieu of wages for a
5761 period during which an employee is absent from work because of
5862 sickness or injury;
5963 (D) as a supplement to a liability insurance
6064 policy;
6165 (E) for credit insurance;
6266 (F) only for dental or vision care;
6367 (G) only for hospital expenses; or
6468 (H) only for indemnity for hospital confinement;
6569 (2) a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
6670 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
6771 (3) medical payment insurance coverage provided under
6872 a motor vehicle insurance policy;
6973 (4) a long-term care insurance policy, including a
7074 nursing home fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner
7175 determines that the policy provides benefit coverage so
7276 comprehensive that the policy is a health benefit plan as described
7377 by Section 1358.101;
7478 (5) health and accident coverage provided by a risk
7579 pool created under Chapter 172, Local Government Code; or
7680 (6) a workers' compensation insurance policy.
7781 Sec. 1358.103. LIMIT ON COST-SHARING REQUIREMENT. (a) In
7882 this section, "insulin" means a prescription drug that contains
7983 insulin and is used to treat diabetes. The term does not include an
8084 insulin drug that is administered to a patient intravenously.
8185 (b) A health benefit plan may not impose a cost-sharing
8286 provision for insulin that is included in the health benefit plan's
8387 formulary if the total amount the enrollee is required to pay
8488 exceeds $25 per prescription for a 30-day supply, regardless of the
8589 amount or type of insulin needed to fill the enrollee's
8690 prescription.
8791 Sec. 1358.104. FORMULARY REQUIREMENT. A health benefit
8892 plan must include at least one insulin from each therapeutic class
8993 in the plan's formulary.
9094 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
9195 a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
9296 renewed on or after January 1, 2022. A health benefit plan
9397 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2022,
9498 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
9599 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
96100 that purpose.
97101 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
98- ______________________________ ______________________________
99- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
100- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 827 passed the Senate on
101- March 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3; and that
102- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
103- following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
104- ______________________________
105- Secretary of the Senate
106- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 827 passed the House, with
107- amendment, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
108- Nays 5, one present not voting.
109- ______________________________
110- Chief Clerk of the House
111- Approved:
112- ______________________________
113- Date
114- ______________________________
115- Governor