Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021