Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB851 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 29, 2021