Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021