Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB860 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021
Analysis March 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021